IA SF2320 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the delivery of restaurant food pursuant to a third-party food delivery service.(Formerly SF 2213.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the delivery of restaurant food pursuant to a third-party food delivery service.(Formerly SF 2213.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2408. S.J. 438. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 323. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 316. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2213 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2320. S.J. 323.
HSB688 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2408.
HF2408 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553.
HSB688 (Related) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2408.
HF2408 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553.