IA SF2319 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Subcommittee, Helland, Petersen, and J. Taylor. H.J. 693.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Subcommittee, Helland, Petersen, and J. Taylor. H.J. 693.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the property tax assessments of certain rental property for low-income and moderate income residents. (Formerly SSB 3046.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the property tax assessments of certain rental property for low-income and moderate income residents. (Formerly SSB 3046.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Subcommittee, Helland, Petersen, and J. Taylor. H.J. 693. | |
2012-03-22 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 635. | |
2012-03-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 634. | |
2012-03-21 | Immediate message. S.J. 643. | |
2012-03-21 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 3. S.J. 642. | |
2012-03-21 | Deferred. S.J. 622. | |
2012-03-15 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2012-03-15 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 573. | |
2012-03-08 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 505. | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 503. |