IA SF2314 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2406. S.J. 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2406. S.J. 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a disaster recovery homeowner assistance program and fund administered by the Iowa finance authority, transfers of moneys to certain funds, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3092; See SF 2406.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a disaster recovery homeowner assistance program and fund administered by the Iowa finance authority, transfers of moneys to certain funds, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3092; See SF 2406.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2406. S.J. 564. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2020 10:30AM RM G17. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Bolkcom, and Breitbach. S.J. 451. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 407. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 356. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 350. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3092 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2314.
HSB619 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277.
HF2406 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 589.
SF2406 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - NOBA: Senate Floor
HF2628 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - NOBA: House Full Approps
HSB619 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277.
HF2406 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 589.
SF2406 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - NOBA: Senate Floor
HF2628 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2314 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2314.html |