IA HSB619 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a disaster recovery homeowner assistance program and fund administered by the Iowa finance authority, transfers of moneys to certain funds, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a disaster recovery homeowner assistance program and fund administered by the Iowa finance authority, transfers of moneys to certain funds, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 11:15AM RM 308. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Bossman and Nielsen. H.J. 190. |
2020-02-04 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3092 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2314.
HF2406 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 589.
SF2314 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2406. S.J. 564.
SF2406 (Replaced by) 2020-06-04 - NOBA: Senate Floor
HF2628 (Replaced by) 2020-06-04 - NOBA: House Full Approps
HF2406 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 589.
SF2314 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2406. S.J. 564.
SF2406 (Replaced by) 2020-06-04 - NOBA: Senate Floor
HF2628 (Replaced by) 2020-06-04 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB619 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB619.html |