IA SF2311 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Amendment H-8162 filed. H.J. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Amendment H-8162 filed. H.J. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the adoption and use of certain general permits issued by the department of natural resources.(Formerly SSB 3052.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the adoption and use of certain general permits issued by the department of natural resources.(Formerly SSB 3052.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment H-8162 filed. H.J. 509. |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8116 filed. H.J. 441. |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 328. |
2022-02-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 326. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 365. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 36, nays 13. S.J. 365. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 329. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 315. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB550 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2347.
SSB3052 (Related) 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2311.
HF2347 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Amendment H-8097 filed. H.J. 436.
SSB3052 (Related) 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2311.
HF2347 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Amendment H-8097 filed. H.J. 436.