IA SF2301 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to health care benefits coverage for specified pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders. (Formerly SF 2084.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to health care benefits coverage for specified pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders. (Formerly SF 2084.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee: Deyoe, Mitchell and Nielsen. H.J. 588.
2020-03-11HouseRead first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 572.
2020-03-10HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 536.
2020-03-10SenateImmediate message. S.J. 550.
2020-03-10SenatePassed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 549.
2020-03-10SenateAmendment S-5071 filed, lost. S.J. 549.
2020-02-19SenateFiscal note.
2020-02-18SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 339.
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 334.

Same As/Similar To

SF2084 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2301. S.J. 339.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback