IA SF2301 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Amendment H-8142 filed. H.J. 568.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Amendment H-8142 filed. H.J. 568.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of elections and voter registration by modifying the close of registration prior to a primary election, modifying the deadline for receipt of absentee ballots by the commissioner, and allowing for changes to the envelopes provided to absentee voters. (Formerly SSB 3131.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of elections and voter registration by modifying the close of registration prior to a primary election, modifying the deadline for receipt of absentee ballots by the commissioner, and allowing for changes to the envelopes provided to absentee voters. (Formerly SSB 3131.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Amendment H-8142 filed. H.J. 568. |
2014-03-21 | House | Referred to State Government. H.J. 560. |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendment H-8132 filed. H.J. 535. |
2014-03-13 | House | Amendment H-8116 filed. H.J. 497. |
2014-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8083 filed. H.J. 450. |
2014-03-04 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 415. |
2014-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 413. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 455. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 452. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5028 adopted. S.J. 452. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5042 filed, lost. S.J. 451. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5028 filed. S.J. 434. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 362. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 344. |