IA SF2296 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 701.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 701.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of solicitation to commit murder and providing a penalty. (Formerly SSB 3154.) Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of solicitation to commit murder and providing a penalty. (Formerly SSB 3154.) Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 701. | |
2012-03-27 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 673. | |
2012-03-27 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 673. | |
2012-03-21 | Message from House. S.J. 644. | |
2012-03-21 | Immediate message. H.J. 627. | |
2012-03-21 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 629. | |
2012-03-21 | Passed House, ayes 84, nays 12. H.J. 625. | |
2012-03-21 | Amendment H-8311 withdrawn. H.J. 625. | |
2012-03-20 | Amendment H-8311 filed. H.J. 614. | |
2012-03-15 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 576. | |
2012-03-08 | Subcommittee, J. Taylor, Lensing, and Rogers. H.J. 492. | |
2012-03-07 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 463. | |
2012-03-06 | Message from Senate. H.J. 457. | |
2012-03-06 | Immediate message. S.J. 458. | |
2012-03-06 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 1. S.J. 454. | |
2012-02-27 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 366. | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 361. |