IA SF2290 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 812.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 812.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to boards of trustees for county and city hospitals. (Formerly SSB 3114.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to boards of trustees for county and city hospitals. (Formerly SSB 3114.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 812. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 793. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 549. |
2018-03-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 487. |
2018-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 514. |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 96 nays none. H.J. 481. |
2018-03-06 | House | Substituted for HF 2380. H.J. 480. |
2018-03-02 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 445. |
2018-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 444. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 509. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 507. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 322. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 317. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3114 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB611 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2380 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 487.
HSB611 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2380 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 487.