IA HF2380 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to boards of trustees for county and city hospitals. (Formerly HSB 611.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to boards of trustees for county and city hospitals. (Formerly HSB 611.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 487. |
2018-03-06 | House | SF 2290 substituted. H.J. 480. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 279. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3114 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB611 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2290 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 812.
HSB611 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2290 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 812.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2380 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2380.html |