IA SF2284 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 493.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 493.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to retail motor fuel sites, by requiring standards and practices to assist disabled individuals obtaining motor fuel, providing for enforcement by the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing for a tax credit, and including effective and applicability date provisions. (Formerly SF 235 and SF 401.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to retail motor fuel sites, by requiring standards and practices to assist disabled individuals obtaining motor fuel, providing for enforcement by the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing for a tax credit, and including effective and applicability date provisions. (Formerly SF 235 and SF 401.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 493. |
2014-03-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 471. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 520. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 14. S.J. 519. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5053 filed, adopted. S.J. 519. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 348. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 342. |