IA SF2280 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the chief information officer to implement a confidential common database in conjunction with state agencies involved with administering or verifying eligibility for public benefits programs. (Formerly SF 2162.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring the chief information officer to implement a confidential common database in conjunction with state agencies involved with administering or verifying eligibility for public benefits programs. (Formerly SF 2162.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-03-03 | House | Subcommittee, Hein, L. Miller, and Steckman. H.J. 379. |
2014-02-28 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 374. |
2014-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 364. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 426. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 423. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 361. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 341. |