IA SF2273 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing the holders of interests in certain entities eligible to hold agricultural land to be elected as trustees of drainage or levee districts. (Formerly SSB 3172.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act allowing the holders of interests in certain entities eligible to hold agricultural land to be elected as trustees of drainage or levee districts. (Formerly SSB 3172.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 719. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 618. |
2014-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 542. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 540. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 494. |
2014-03-05 | House | Subcommittee, Maxwell, Moore, and Muhlbauer. H.J. 448. |
2014-02-27 | House | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 366. |
2014-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 364. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 420. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 419. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 348. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 340. |