IA SF2269 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Subcommittee, Holt, Heartsill, and Olson. H.J. 447.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Subcommittee, Holt, Heartsill, and Olson. H.J. 447.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to studying community violence by the public safety advisory board. (Formerly SF 2230.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to studying community violence by the public safety advisory board. (Formerly SF 2230.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Subcommittee, Holt, Heartsill, and Olson. H.J. 447. |
2016-03-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 380. |
2016-03-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 375. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 408. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 408. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5042 filed, adopted. S.J. 408. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 285. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 280. |