IA SF2262 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - Subcommittee, Koester, Dolecheck, and Gaines. H.J. 448.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - Subcommittee, Koester, Dolecheck, and Gaines. H.J. 448.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring radon testing in public schools and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2127.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring radon testing in public schools and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2127.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Subcommittee, Koester, Dolecheck, and Gaines. H.J. 448. |
2014-03-04 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 414. |
2014-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 412. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 462. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 35, nays 14. S.J. 460. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5043 filed, adopted. S.J. 459. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5039 adopted. S.J. 459. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5039 filed. S.J. 448. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 350. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 339. |