IA SF2257 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 810.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 810.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to juvenile justice including juvenile delinquency, child in need of assistance and family in need of assistance proceedings, juvenile justice reform, and juvenile court expenses and costs, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3102.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to juvenile justice including juvenile delinquency, child in need of assistance and family in need of assistance proceedings, juvenile justice reform, and juvenile court expenses and costs, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3102.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 810. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | HF 2507 substituted. S.J. 808. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5139 adopted. S.J. 808. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5139 filed. S.J. 803. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2507. S.J. 500. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 264. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 262. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB653 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2507.
SSB3102 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2257.
HF2507 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Fiscal note.
SSB3102 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2257.
HF2507 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Fiscal note.