IA SSB3102 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2257
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2507
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2507
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2257.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to juvenile justice including juvenile delinquency, child in need of assistance and family in need of assistance proceedings, juvenile justice reform, and juvenile court expenses and costs, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2257.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to juvenile justice including juvenile delinquency, child in need of assistance and family in need of assistance proceedings, juvenile justice reform, and juvenile court expenses and costs, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2257.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2257. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 2:30PM Room G15. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Ragan. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB653 (Related) 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2507.
SF2257 (Replaced by) 2022-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 810.
HF2507 (Replaced by) 2022-06-30 - Fiscal note.
SF2257 (Replaced by) 2022-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 810.
HF2507 (Replaced by) 2022-06-30 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB3102 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB3102.html |