IA SF2254 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Sponsors withdrawn. S.J. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Sponsors withdrawn. S.J. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a moratorium relating to the construction, including expansion, of certain confinement feeding operation structures, requesting an interim study committee, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a moratorium relating to the construction, including expansion, of certain confinement feeding operation structures, requesting an interim study committee, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Celsi [D] | Sen. Pam Jochum [D] | Sen. Joseph Bolkcom [D] | Sen. Eric Giddens [D] |
Sen. Herman Quirmbach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Sponsors withdrawn. S.J. 345. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kapucian, Edler, and Kinney. S.J. 323. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 302. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2127 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2254 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2254.html |