IA SF2254 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of county treasurers to assess certain property associated with fence disputes and water districts. Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of county treasurers to assess certain property associated with fence disputes and water districts. Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 963. | |
2010-03-15 | Immediate message. S.J. 821. | |
2010-03-15 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 821. | |
2010-03-15 | Senate concurred with S-5223. S.J. 821. | |
2010-03-10 | Message from House, with amendment S-5223. S.J. 756. | |
2010-03-09 | Immediate message. H.J. 887. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 875. | |
2010-03-09 | Committee amendment H-8291 adopted. H.J. 875. | |
2010-03-01 | Committee amendment H-8291 filed. H.J. 776. | |
2010-03-01 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 775. | |
2010-02-17 | Subcommittee, Kuhn, Cohoon, and Tjepkes. H.J. 599. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time, referred to Local Government. H.J. 570. | |
2010-02-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 564. | |
2010-02-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 425. | |
2010-02-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 425. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 337. | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 329. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0811B&ga=83 |