IA SF2248 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 560.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 560.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to management of the emerald ash borer. (Formerly SF 2159.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to management of the emerald ash borer. (Formerly SF 2159.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 560. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 495. |
2014-03-05 | House | Subcommittee, Rayhons, Ruff, and Salmon. H.J. 448. |
2014-03-04 | House | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 384. |
2014-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 382. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 443. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 43, nays 5. S.J. 441. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5032 filed, adopted. S.J. 441. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 310. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 305. |