IA SF2240 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the receipt of pecuniary damages by insurers as victims of insurance fraud for purposes of criminal restitution. (Formerly SSB 3061.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the receipt of pecuniary damages by insurers as victims of insurance fraud for purposes of criminal restitution. (Formerly SSB 3061.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 684.
2018-03-14SenateHF 2238 substituted. S.J. 683.
2018-02-21SenateAttached to companion HF 2238. S.J. 410.
2018-02-12SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 295.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 285.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3061 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB585 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2238 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 652.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback