IA HF2238 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the receipt of pecuniary damages by insurers as victims of insurance fraud for purposes of criminal restitution. (Formerly HSB 585.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the receipt of pecuniary damages by insurers as victims of insurance fraud for purposes of criminal restitution. (Formerly HSB 585.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 652.
2018-03-21HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 652.
2018-03-21HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 652.
2018-03-15HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 593.
2018-03-14SenateImmediate message. S.J. 684.
2018-03-14SenatePassed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 684.
2018-03-14SenateSubstituted for SF 2240. S.J. 683.
2018-02-21SenateRead first time and attached to companion SF 2240. S.J. 410.
2018-02-21SenateMessage from House. S.J. 410.
2018-02-21HouseImmediate message. H.J. 351.
2018-02-22HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 372.
2018-02-21HousePassed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 347.
2018-02-21HouseAmendment H-8049 adopted. H.J. 346.
2018-02-19HouseAmendment H-8049 filed. H.J. 308.
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 203.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3061 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB585 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2240 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 684.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback