IA SF2234 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to probate, by amending the court fees in probate and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3016.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to probate, by amending the court fees in probate and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3016.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Breitbach, and Hogg. S.J. 512. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 479. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 293. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 284. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB503 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3016 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2229 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2421 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 593.
SSB3016 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2229 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2421 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 593.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2234 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2234.html |