IA HF2229 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to probate, by amending the court fees in probate and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 503; See HF 2421.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to probate, by amending the court fees in probate and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 503; See HF 2421.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Baltimore, Nunn and Wolfe. H.J. 217. |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 202. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB503 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3016 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2234 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2421 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 593.
SSB3016 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2234 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2421 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 593.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2229 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2229.html |