IA SF2231 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 929.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 929.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefits managers, pharmacies, and prescription drug benefits, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly SF 2092.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefits managers, pharmacies, and prescription drug benefits, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly SF 2092.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 929. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | HF 2384 substituted. S.J. 928. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5158 adopted. S.J. 928. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5158 filed. S.J. 897. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2384. S.J. 619. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 254. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 245. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2092 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2231. S.J. 254.
HSB623 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2384.
HF2384 (Similar To) 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.
HSB623 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2384.
HF2384 (Similar To) 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.