IA HF2384 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefits managers, pharmacies, and prescription drug benefits, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 623.) Effective date: 06/13/2022. Applicability date: 06/13/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pharmacy benefits managers, pharmacies, and prescription drug benefits, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 623.) Effective date: 06/13/2022. Applicability date: 06/13/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 944. |
2022-06-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 934. |
2022-05-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 938. |
2022-06-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0. H.J. 937. |
2022-05-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8401. H.J. 937. |
2022-05-24 | House | Senate amendment H-8401 filed. H.J. 941. |
2022-05-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 936. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 929. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 928. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5182 filed, adopted. S.J. 928. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5159 withdrawn. S.J. 928. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2231. S.J. 928. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5159 filed. S.J. 897. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2231. S.J. 619. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 619. |
2022-03-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 654. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 653. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8198 adopted, as amended. H.J. 652. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8221 to amendment H-8198 withdrawn. H.J. 652. |
2022-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8260 to amendment H-8198 filed, adopted. H.J. 652. |
2022-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8221 filed. H.J. 628. |
2022-03-21 | House | Amendment H-8198 filed. H.J. 601. |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 590. |
2022-03-01 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 249. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2092 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2231. S.J. 254.
HSB623 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2384.
SF2231 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 929.
HSB623 (Related) 2022-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2384.
SF2231 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 929.