IA SF2226 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Subcommittee, L. Miller, Abdul-Samad, and Hanusa. H.J. 370.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Subcommittee, L. Miller, Abdul-Samad, and Hanusa. H.J. 370.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a low-income program supplement for school districts to provide programs serving low-income pupils. (Formerly SSB 3160.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a low-income program supplement for school districts to provide programs serving low-income pupils. (Formerly SSB 3160.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee, L. Miller, Abdul-Samad, and Hanusa. H.J. 370. |
2014-02-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 350. |
2014-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 349. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 409. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21. S.J. 408. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 286. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 284. |