IA SF2222 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. [].
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. [].
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county board of supervisors' approval of sanitary district tax levies, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to county board of supervisors' approval of sanitary district tax levies, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. []. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 11:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Guth, and Quirmbach. S.J. 238. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 222. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2222 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2222.html |