IA SF2205 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Fiscal note. SCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to varsity interscholastic athletic contests and athletic competitions eligibility limitations for pupils who participate in open enrollment, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2132.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to varsity interscholastic athletic contests and athletic competitions eligibility limitations for pupils who participate in open enrollment, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2132.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5103. S.J. 596. |
2016-03-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 546. |
2016-03-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 551. |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 538. |
2016-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8137 adopted. H.J. 538. |
2016-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8137 filed. H.J. 524. |
2016-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 506. |
2016-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 428. |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Subcommittee, Byrnes, Brown-Powers, and Stanerson. H.J. 348. |
2016-02-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 334. |
2016-02-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 317. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 337. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 335. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 245. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 239. |