IA SF2201 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Message from House, with amendment S-5083. S.J. 611.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Message from House, with amendment S-5083. S.J. 611.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to kidnapping, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3079.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to kidnapping, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3079.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5083. S.J. 611. |
2014-03-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 519. |
2014-03-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 549. |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 3. H.J. 518. |
2014-03-24 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendment H-8104 adopted. H.J. 518. |
2014-03-18 | House | Committee amendment H-8090 adopted. H.J. 518. |
2014-03-11 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8104 filed. H.J. 469. |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee amendment H-8090 filed. H.J. 450. |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 449. |
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee, Baltimore, Heartsill, and Wolfe. H.J. 370. |
2014-02-26 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 343. |
2014-02-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 313. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 375. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 374. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5016 filed, adopted. S.J. 374. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 276. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 267. |