IA SF2186 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Withdrawn. S.J. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Withdrawn. S.J. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the confidentiality of information filed with the court to secure an arrest warrant. (Formerly SSB 3041.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the confidentiality of information filed with the court to secure an arrest warrant. (Formerly SSB 3041.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 666. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | HF 2474 substituted. S.J. 665. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2474. S.J. 526. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 243. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 235. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3041 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2186.
HSB613 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 298.
HF2474 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
HSB613 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 298.
HF2474 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2186 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2186.html |