IA SF2169 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to wills including witness testimony, distribution of property, and claims of personal representatives, and including retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3143.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to wills including witness testimony, distribution of property, and claims of personal representatives, and including retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3143.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 651. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 633. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 633. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 489. |
2014-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 436. |
2014-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 467. |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 435. |
2014-03-05 | House | Substituted for HF 2403. H.J. 435. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed on file. H.J. 368. |
2014-02-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 320. |
2014-02-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 313. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 337. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 333. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 248. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 244. |