IA SF2150 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act incorporating provisions related to pregnancy and fetal development into the human growth and development and health curriculum provided by school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, charter schools, and innovation zone schools to students enrolled in grades one through twelve.
Title
A bill for an act incorporating provisions related to pregnancy and fetal development into the human growth and development and health curriculum provided by school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, charter schools, and innovation zone schools to students enrolled in grades one through twelve.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Alons [R] | Sen. Sandy Salmon [R] | Sen. Jeff Taylor [R] | Sen. Dennis Guth [R] |
Sen. Jesse Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 2:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Donahue, and Salmon. S.J. 227. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 167. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2031 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 450.
HF2617 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
HF2617 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2150 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2150.html |