IA SF2140 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2310. S.J. 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2310. S.J. 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the display of a validation sticker on a vehicle registration plate.(See SF 2310.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the display of a validation sticker on a vehicle registration plate.(See SF 2310.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2310. S.J. 279. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 11:00AM Room 315. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Koelker, and Winckler. S.J. 183. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 165. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2310 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 279.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2140 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2140.html |