IA SF2138 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 782.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 782.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the rights of a donee created by an anatomical gift. (Formerly SSB 3108.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the rights of a donee created by an anatomical gift. (Formerly SSB 3108.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 782. | |
2010-03-08 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 721. | |
2010-03-08 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 721. | |
2010-03-02 | Message from House. S.J. 623. | |
2010-03-01 | Immediate message. H.J. 773. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 765. | |
2010-03-01 | Substituted for HF 2285. H.J. 764. | |
2010-02-04 | Passed on file. H.J. 266. | |
2010-02-03 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 249. | |
2010-02-03 | Message from Senate. H.J. 241. | |
2010-02-02 | Immediate message. S.J. 252. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 245. | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 203. | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 197. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0691B&ga=83 |