IA SF2131 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 650.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 650.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to standard valuation and standard forfeiture provisions for life insurance policies or contracts and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3089.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to standard valuation and standard forfeiture provisions for life insurance policies or contracts and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3089.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 650. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 633. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 633. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Secretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 632. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 455. |
2014-03-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 398. |
2014-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 416. |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 392. |
2014-03-04 | House | Substituted for HF 2219. H.J. 391. |
2014-02-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 319. |
2014-02-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 310. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 327. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 323. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5012 filed, adopted. S.J. 323. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 221. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 218. |