IA SF213 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to employment matters involving public employees including collective bargaining, educator employment matters, personnel records and settlement agreements, city civil service requirements, and health insurance matters, making penalties applicable, and including effective date, applicability, and transition provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to employment matters involving public employees including collective bargaining, educator employment matters, personnel records and settlement agreements, city civil service requirements, and health insurance matters, making penalties applicable, and including effective date, applicability, and transition provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 345.
2017-02-16SenateCall of the Senate lifted. S.J. 344.
2017-02-16SenateHouse File 291 substituted. S.J. 341.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3025 and S-3024 lost. S.J. 340.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3029 lost. S.J. 339.
2017-02-16SenateAttached to companion HF 291. S.J. 339.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3022, S-3019, S-3023, and S-3020 out of order. S.J. 338.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3028 adopted. S.J. 338.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3073 and S-3071 lost. S.J. 337.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3072 lost. S.J. 336.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3059 and S-3069 lost. S.J. 335.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3040 lost. S.J. 334.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3065 and S-3064 lost. S.J. 333.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3057 lost. S.J. 332.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3061 and S-3053 lost. S.J. 331.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3060 lost. S.J. 330.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3079 and S-3046 lost. S.J. 329.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3070 lost. S.J. 328.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3062 and S-3063 lost. S.J. 327.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3058 lost. S.J. 326.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3054 and S-3055 lost. S.J. 325.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3048 lost. S.J. 324.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3042 and S-3047 lost. S.J. 323.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3041 lost. S.J. 322.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3038 and S-3039 lost. S.J. 321.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3078 lost. S.J. 320.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3077 lost. S.J. 319.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3049 lost. S.J. 318.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3076 lost. S.J. 317.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3067 lost. S.J. 316.
2017-02-16SenateAmendments S-3066 and S-3052 lost. S.J. 315.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3068 lost. S.J. 314.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3075 lost. S.J. 313.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3074 lost. S.J. 312.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3043 withdrawn. S.J. 311.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3056 lost. S.J. 311.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3045 lost. S.J. 310.
2017-02-16SenateCall of the Senate requested. S.J. 310.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3026 out of order. S.J. 309.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3051 lost. S.J. 308.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3050 lost. S.J. 308.
2017-02-16SenateAmendment S-3044 withdrawn. S.J. 307.
2017-02-16SenateMotion to set time certain, adopted. S.J. 306.
2017-02-16SenateMotion to amend the motion for time certain, lost. S.J. 306.
2017-02-16SenateMotion to set time certain. S.J. 305.
2017-02-15SenateAmendments S-3045, S-3046, S-3047, S-3048, S-3049, S-3050, S-3051, S-3052, S-3053, S-3054, S-3055, S-3056, S-3057, S-3058, S-3059, S-3060, S-3061, S-3062, S-3063, S-3064, S-3065, S-3066, S-3067, S-3068, S-3069, S-3070, S-3071, S-3072, S-3073, S-3074, S-3075, S-3076, S-3077, S-3078, and S-3079 filed. S.J. 304.
2017-02-15SenateAmendments S-3038, S-3039, S-3040, S-3041, S-3042, S-3043, and S-3044. filed. S.J. 303.
2017-02-15SenateDeferred. S.J. 295.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3037 filed, lost. S.J. 295.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3036 filed, lost. S.J. 294.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3035 filed, lost. S.J. 293.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3034 filed, lost. S.J. 292.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3033 filed, lost. S.J. 291.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3032 filed, lost. S.J. 290.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3030 lost. S.J. 289.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3031 lost. S.J. 288.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3027 lost. S.J. 287.
2017-02-15SenateAmendment S-3018 lost. S.J. 286.
2017-02-14SenateFiscal note. Senate Clip Sheet.
2017-02-14SenateAmendments S-3019, S-3020, S-3022, S-3023, S-3024, S-3025, S-3026, S-3027, S-3028, S-3029, S-3030, and S-3031 filed. S.J. 283.
2017-02-14SenateDeferred. S.J. 278.
2017-02-14SenateAmendment S-3021 filed, lost. S.J. 276.
2017-02-13SenateAmendment S-3018 filed. S.J. 272.
2017-02-09SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 255.
2017-02-07SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Boulton, and Chapman. S.J. 234.
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 231.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback