IA HSB84 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF213
Note: Legislation replaced by HF291
Note: Legislation replaced by HF291
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to employment matters involving public employees including collective bargaining, educator employment matters, personnel records and settlement agreements, city civil service requirements, and health insurance matters, making penalties applicable, and including effective date, applicability, and transition provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to employment matters involving public employees including collective bargaining, educator employment matters, personnel records and settlement agreements, city civil service requirements, and health insurance matters, making penalties applicable, and including effective date, applicability, and transition provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 265. |
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, Holt and Hunter. H.J. 245. |
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2017 8:45AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber |
2017-02-07 | House | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
SF213 (Replaced by) 2017-02-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 345.
HF291 (Replaced by) 2017-02-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 414.
HF291 (Replaced by) 2017-02-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 414.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB84 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB84.html |