IA SF2122 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing, ordering, dispensing, and administering authority of pharmacists and practitioners.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing, ordering, dispensing, and administering authority of pharmacists and practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 3:00PM Room G15. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Salmon, Celsi, and Westrich. S.J. 170. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 150. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2122 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2122.html |