IA SF2111 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to long acting reversible contraceptive options under the Medicaid program.
Title
A bill for an act relating to long acting reversible contraceptive options under the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Garrett, and Mathis. S.J. 239. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 174. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2161 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2111 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2111.html |