IA SF2111 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - Subcommittee, Baltimore, Massie, and R. Olson. H.J. 406.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - Subcommittee, Baltimore, Massie, and R. Olson. H.J. 406.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including restitution plan hearings, crime victim compensation, and the identity theft passport program. (Formerly SSB 3055.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including restitution plan hearings, crime victim compensation, and the identity theft passport program. (Formerly SSB 3055.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Subcommittee, Baltimore, Massie, and R. Olson. H.J. 406. | |
2012-02-29 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 380. | |
2012-02-28 | Message from Senate. H.J. 342. | |
2012-02-27 | Immediate message. S.J. 340. | |
2012-02-27 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 340. | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment S-5008 lost. S.J. 339. | |
2012-02-06 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2012-02-06 | Amendment S-5008 filed. S.J. 193. | |
2012-02-01 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 168. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 164. |