IA SF2101 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to purple marks or caps on top of trees or posts to indicate that unlawful entry constitutes criminal trespass and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2002.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to purple marks or caps on top of trees or posts to indicate that unlawful entry constitutes criminal trespass and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 2002.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseSubcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
2018-03-09HouseSubcommittee: Hein, Meyer and Paustian. H.J. 552.
2018-03-08HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 519.
2018-03-07HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 494.
2018-03-07SenateImmediate message. S.J. 575.
2018-03-07SenatePassed Senate, ayes 38, nays 11. S.J. 572.
2018-03-07SenateAmendment S-5125 filed, adopted. S.J. 571.
2018-01-24SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 158.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 152.

Same As/Similar To

SF2002 (Similar To) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback