IA SF2002 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to purple marks or caps on top of trees or posts to indicate that unlawful entry constitutes criminal trespass and making penalties applicable. (See SF 2101.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to purple marks or caps on top of trees or posts to indicate that unlawful entry constitutes criminal trespass and making penalties applicable. (See SF 2101.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 84. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 40. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2101 (Similar To) 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2002 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2002.html |