IA SF2101 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 456.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 456.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act appropriating funds for a supported employment provider rate increase, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2046.)
Title
A bill for an act appropriating funds for a supported employment provider rate increase, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 2046.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 456. |
2016-03-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 438. |
2016-03-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 430. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 451. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 451. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 167. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 159. |