IA SF2085 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Feenstra, and Quirmbach. S.J. 186.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Feenstra, and Quirmbach. S.J. 186.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging under certain circumstances.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Feenstra, and Quirmbach. S.J. 186. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 149. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2098 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 212.
HF2281 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Fiscal note.
HF2281 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2085 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2085.html |