IA SF2076 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Reichman. S.J. 268.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Reichman. S.J. 268.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county commissions of veteran affairs training, and making appropriations.
Title
A bill for an act relating to county commissions of veteran affairs training, and making appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Reichman. S.J. 268. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 244. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 229. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 11:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Salmon, McClintock, and Weiner. S.J. 139. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 130. |