IA SF2053 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2024 8:30AM Room 315.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2024 8:30AM Room 315.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the tax exemption of religious institution or society property being used for educational purposes by a third party, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the tax exemption of religious institution or society property being used for educational purposes by a third party, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2024 8:30AM Room 315. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Dawson, and Dotzler. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 113. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2053 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2053.html |