IA SF2051 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2195. S.J. 263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2195. S.J. 263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing that certain multi-story commercial buildings are not required to have commercial elevators in specified circumstances. (See SF 2195.)
Title
A bill for an act providing that certain multi-story commercial buildings are not required to have commercial elevators in specified circumstances. (See SF 2195.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2195. S.J. 263. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 3:30PM RM G17. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Greene, and Hogg. S.J. 121. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 118. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2195 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 863.
HSB667 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295.
HF2456 (Similar To) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 625.
HSB667 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295.
HF2456 (Similar To) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 625.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2051 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2051.html |