IA HSB667 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing that certain multi-story commercial buildings are not required to have commercial elevators in specified circumstances.
Title
A bill for an act providing that certain multi-story commercial buildings are not required to have commercial elevators in specified circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Landon, Mitchell and McConkey. H.J. 252. |
2020-02-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF2051 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2195. S.J. 263.
SF2195 (Replaced by) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 863.
HF2456 (Replaced by) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 625.
SF2195 (Replaced by) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 863.
HF2456 (Replaced by) 2020-06-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 625.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB667 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB667.html |