IA SF2043 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2242. S.J. 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2242. S.J. 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to special landowner deer hunting licenses.(See SF 2242.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to special landowner deer hunting licenses.(See SF 2242.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2242. S.J. 241. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2024 11:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Rozenboom, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 126. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 105. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2015 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
SF2242 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 581.
SF2242 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 581.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2043 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2043.html |